U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiggins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 02, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2022: [Indictment ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 23, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release ]
  • May 16, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 05, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 03, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 03, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 22, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.