U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hershey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • April 22, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 22, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.