U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00377-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freeman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Reply to Response ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 22, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.