U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03143
  • Case Name: Moore v. Hughes et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 27, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 24, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 06, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.