U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02074
  • Case Name: Ward v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 28, 2022: [Opinion from USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [USCA PLRA Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 08, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • August 08, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 20, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 06, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.