U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02073
  • Case Name: Gill v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 10, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 31, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 10, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 06, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.