U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03142
  • Case Name: Harris v. Grover et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
  • November 16, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 18, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 17, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 17, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 13, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.