U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03145
  • Case Name: Belfield v. Greenwood et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • April 04, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 03, 2025: [Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Rejection/Acceptance of Assistance from NCPLS]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice to Plaintiff Regarding North Carolina Prisoner Legal Services Inc]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 05, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 24, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 06, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.