U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03144
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Koonch et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 06, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.