U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02076
  • Case Name: Chamberlain v. NC Department of Public Safety
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • October 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • August 01, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 26, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.