U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.