U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUTTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 21, 2023: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 16, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 02, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Exhibit Receipt - Local Rule 79.4]
  • October 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • August 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 03, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.