U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WATSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • November 22, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • October 28, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response - non motion]
  • October 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 06, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Arraignment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 28, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.