U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SALINAS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 23, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 20, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 21, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • June 10, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 09, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.