U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUMPERS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • December 05, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 05, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • December 02, 2022: [Demand for Alibi Witness ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sever]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • September 08, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • September 06, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Superseding Indictment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 12, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 09, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.