U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RICHARDSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [SEALED Reason for Amendment]
  • January 24, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • October 27, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • October 25, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 20, 2022: [SEALED USPO Memorandum]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • August 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.