U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02078
  • Case Name: Bell v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Dever]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • June 30, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • June 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 30, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • May 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 05, 2022: [Case Submitted]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.