U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03146
  • Case Name: Tyler v. Rouse et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 10, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2023: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • October 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 05, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 29, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2022: [Text Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2022: [Rejection/Acceptance of Assistance from NCPLS]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.