U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03147
  • Case Name: Williams v. Mason et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 26, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [Complaint]
  • April 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.