U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • July 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • July 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 09, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.