U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEWIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 14, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • October 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • September 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • September 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.