U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCNEILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • September 20, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 09, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 08, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 02, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.