U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TERRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 12, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • July 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 10, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.