U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOSES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • December 14, 2022: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised Final]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 03, 2022: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • November 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 14, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 13, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 02, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • August 02, 2022: [SEALED Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 13, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.