U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AGUILAR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Factual Basis Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • December 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.