U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCLAURIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 20, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.