U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 07, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.