U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PAUL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Probation Petition Amended 12C/Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 13, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 13, 2025: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [SEALED USPO Amended Petition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • November 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • September 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.