U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BALDWIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Motions Referred]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • July 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 03, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 31, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 27, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 24, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.