U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 05, 2023: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Status Report ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice-Other]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 29, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • June 22, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.