U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORALES-CARMEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Docket Text/Event Modification]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • September 09, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Corrected Document]
  • August 11, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 07, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 06, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.