U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilmore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 22, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 16, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 16, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.