U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03149
  • Case Name: Truesdale v. United States Department of Justice et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response]
  • May 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice-other]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • March 14, 2025: [Default Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 19, 2022: [Document]
  • October 17, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [Document]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 08, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 16, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 27, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • April 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.