U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-mj-01135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alonso
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 27, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.