U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00015
  • Case Name: Rudisill v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Mandate - USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Opinion - USCA]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Case Number - Court of Appeals]
  • June 15, 2022: [Electronic Record Transmitted]
  • June 15, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Complaint Deficiency Notice]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.