U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gangrade
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 27, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 27, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.