U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02080
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Figueroa
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice-other]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • July 15, 2022: [Appoint Expert]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • July 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2022: [Remark]
  • June 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 27, 2022: [Stay]
  • April 27, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 27, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.