U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sherrington
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Compel ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Produce ]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 29, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 27, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 27, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.