U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vidales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • June 17, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • June 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • June 08, 2022: [Seal]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 27, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • April 27, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.