U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Bond Revocation Hearing ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Release Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • August 12, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Bond ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.