U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Milam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Remark]
  • August 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 05, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 05, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.