U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Atkinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 10, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 29, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 29, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.