U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arrona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.