U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEDESMA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 22, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2022: [Probation Petition/Order-Summons]
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.