U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 16, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.