U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • July 26, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 04, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.