U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pait
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Seal ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • July 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Seal ]
  • July 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - First Step Act]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Motion for Compassionate Release - First Step Act]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.