U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:03-cr-00439-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FAGAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Garnishment]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • December 16, 2022: [Garnishment]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 29, 2022: [Declaration of Proof of Service]
  • September 12, 2022: [Request]
  • September 12, 2022: [Objection]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice to Defendant Debtor]
  • August 12, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment Issued]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Application for Writ by USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.