U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Status Report ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 30, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.