U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Probation Report - Amendment 821 - Criminal History]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Release Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 14, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • May 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 16, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • May 13, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 05, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.